Feb. 11, 2010 at 8:42 p.m.
Filed under:
Personnel moves,
Retail
Associated Press | OfficeMax Inc. said Thursday its chairman and chief executive will retire early next year and the office-supply retailer plans to launch a national search for a new CEO.
Sam Duncan has been chief executive since 2005. He plans to retire on Feb. 28, 2011 and also will step down from the board at that time.
The company said it will consider both internal and outside candidates
for his replacement. Duncan has agreed to stay on until a successor is
in place.
Sam Duncan, CEO of OfficeMax >>
Feb. 11, 2010 at 2:17 p.m.
Filed under:
Personnel moves
By Mary Ellen Podmolik | Morton’s Restaurant Group, Inc. announced that Thomas Baldwin, its chairman, chief executive officer and president, has resigned from the company after 21 years there.
Morton’s said it appointed Christopher Artinian, 40, as its chief executive officer, president and as a director. Artinian joined the company in 1995 and most recently served as vice president of Eastern operations for Morton’s of Chicago Inc., a subsidiary.
Get the full story »
Feb. 8, 2010 at 10:06 a.m.
Filed under:
Advertising/Marketing,
Personnel moves
Tribune staff report | Bally Total Fitness announced that it has appointed Dennis Cary as its senior vice president and chief marketing officer, effective today. Cary
will report directly to Bally CEO Mike Sheehan.
Get the full story »
Feb. 8, 2010 at 7:19 a.m.
Filed under:
Airlines,
Personnel moves
By Mary Ellen Podmolik |
United Airlines said it appointed Rohit Philip as its senior
vice president of corporate strategy and business development, a new
post at the Chicago-based airline, effective immediately.
Get the full story »
Feb. 4, 2010 at 6:31 a.m.
Filed under:
Consulting,
Health care,
Personnel moves
Tribune staff report | Navigant Consulting Inc. announced Marc Bard has been appointed Chief Innovation Officer of the company’s Healthcare practice.
In the role, Bard will work with healthcare payers and providers to design and implement solutions for improving clinical outcomes, care processes and business performance.
See announcement: tradingmarkets.com
Feb. 3, 2010 at 6:17 a.m.
Filed under:
Personnel moves,
Real estate
From CoStar Group: General Growth Properties board member Glenn Rufrano has been named president and chief executive of commercial real estate firm Cushman & Wakefield.
Read full story: costar.com
Feb. 1, 2010 at 10:17 a.m.
Filed under:
Personnel moves
By Melissa Harris | Dennis Culloton, the public relations man who counseled the Ricketts family through its acquisition of the Chicago Cubs last year, is leaving Guy Chipparoni’s Res Publica Group and striking out on his own.
Get the full story »
Feb. 1, 2010 at 6:34 a.m.
Filed under:
Investing,
Personnel moves
Tribune staff report | Investment research provider Morningstar Inc. said today it has approinted Hugh Zentmyer, 63 to serve on its board of directors. Zentmyer was an executive vice president of the food equipment segment at Illinois Tool Works before his retirement in January.